NY A08245 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8501b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8501b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of tickets to places of entertainment; establishes notice and disclosure requirements for the sale or resale of tickets.
Title
Relates to the sale of tickets to places of entertainment; establishes notice and disclosure requirements for the sale or resale of tickets.
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8501b |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.444 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8245c |
2018-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 8245b |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | print number 8245a |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S08501 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.110