NY A08244 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5965
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5965
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the implementation by colleges and universities of sexual assault, dating violence, domestic violence and stalking prevention and response policies and procedures; relates to privacy of name in certain legal challenges to college/university disciplinary findings; appropriates money therefor.
Title
Relates to the implementation by colleges and universities of sexual assault, dating violence, domestic violence and stalking prevention and response policies and procedures; relates to privacy of name in certain legal challenges to college/university disciplinary findings; appropriates money therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5965 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.634 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05965 (Same As) 2015-07-07 - SIGNED CHAP.76