NY A08235 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - signed chap.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - signed chap.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of part RR of chapter 57 of the laws of 2008 relating to administration of certain funds and accounts.
Title
Extends provisions of part RR of chapter 57 of the laws of 2008 relating to administration of certain funds and accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Senate | signed chap.94 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1198 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5665 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.168 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.168 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05665 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8235