NY A08228 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rent increase exemption orders.
Title
Relates to rent increase exemption orders.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Pamela Harris [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.343 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1093 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6214A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.793 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | print number 8228a |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | committed to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.335 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.697 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.697 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | referred to aging |