NY A08220 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - print number 8220a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to purchasing restrictions on persons boycotting Israel and the investment of certain public funds in companies boycotting Israel; requires the commissioner of general services to compile a list of companies boycotting Israel and establishes that such companies will be considered non-responsive bidders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to purchasing restrictions on persons boycotting Israel and the investment of certain public funds in companies boycotting Israel; requires the commissioner of general services to compile a list of companies boycotting Israel and establishes that such companies will be considered non-responsive bidders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29Assemblyprint number 8220a
2016-03-29Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2015-06-12Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06086 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback