NY A08219 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s5610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s5610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a bridge on state route 19, which crosses interstate route 86, in the town of Amity, county of Allegany, as the "Corporal Jason Dunham Memorial Bridge"; designates that portion of state route 19 which is within the town of Amity, as the "Corporal Jason Dunham Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a bridge on state route 19, which crosses interstate route 86, in the town of Amity, county of Allegany, as the "Corporal Jason Dunham Memorial Bridge"; designates that portion of state route 19 which is within the town of Amity, as the "Corporal Jason Dunham Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted by s5610 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.582 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.582 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05610 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.356