NY A08215 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collection of an incarceration fee.
Title
Relates to the collection of an incarceration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.753 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.494 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5981 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.133 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05981 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8215