NY A08201 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - print number 8201a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - print number 8201a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Title
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | print number 8201a |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04964 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to transportation