NY A08200 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 8200a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 8200a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that family members of paid professional firefighters who died in the line-of-duty may obtain a "Survivor of the Bravest" license plate; provides for the annual service charge collected to be deposited into the department of motor vehicles distinctive license plate development fund.
Title
Provides that family members of paid professional firefighters who died in the line-of-duty may obtain a "Survivor of the Bravest" license plate; provides for the annual service charge collected to be deposited into the department of motor vehicles distinctive license plate development fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | print number 8200a |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00226 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - referred to transportation