NY A08181 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 8181a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 8181a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the salary base for members of the city of New York fire department pension fund whose employment with the fire department of the city of New York commenced on or after July 1, 2000 shall be determined in the same manner as members whose employment commenced prior to such date.
Title
Provides that the salary base for members of the city of New York fire department pension fund whose employment with the fire department of the city of New York commenced on or after July 1, 2000 shall be determined in the same manner as members whose employment commenced prior to such date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Assembly | print number 8181a |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05585 (Same As) 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5585B