NY A08181 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the duties of the state director of the division of veterans' affairs; repeals provisions relating to reports on certain children of Vietnam veterans.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the duties of the state director of the division of veterans' affairs; repeals provisions relating to reports on certain children of Vietnam veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.718 |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 8181a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06003 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES