NY A08163 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notice to a defendant of his or her right to complete court ordered alcohol or substance use treatment in a nonreligious treatment program.
Title
Requires written notice to a defendant of his or her right to complete court ordered alcohol or substance use treatment in a nonreligious treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.147 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1769 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7313A |
2022-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.364 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | print number 8163a |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07313 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8163A