NY A08160 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5153a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5153a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a performance of duty disability to Suffolk county probation officers.
Title
Provides a performance of duty disability to Suffolk county probation officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5153a |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.546 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | print number 8160a |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05153 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.559