NY A08159 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s5356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s5356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Title
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5356 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05356 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.166