NY A08136 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tracts of land for bike paths.
Title
Relates to tracts of land for bike paths.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.287 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1627 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6398 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.308 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06398 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.287