NY A08135 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Title
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.344 |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 8135b |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | print number 8135a |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06013 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - PRINT NUMBER 6013A