NY A08134 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in the state on and after July 1, 2021 be bioheating fuel that contains a minimum percent biodiesel or renewable hydrocarbon diesel.
Title
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in the state on and after July 1, 2021 be bioheating fuel that contains a minimum percent biodiesel or renewable hydrocarbon diesel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06344 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 6344A