NY A08127 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in formulating its capital program plans, the metropolitan transportation authority shall develop criteria to determine how to best prioritize subway stations for accessibility improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that in formulating its capital program plans, the metropolitan transportation authority shall develop criteria to determine how to best prioritize subway stations for accessibility improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.793
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6430
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.239
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.239
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06430 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8127

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8127
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08127
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8127#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback