NY A08126 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups, including membership in racial and ethnic, religious, sexual and gender minority groups.
Title
Relates to reviewing suicide prevention programs periodically and making recommendations regarding cultural and linguistic competency and best practices for screening and interventions aimed at addressing suicide risk factors for minority groups, including membership in racial and ethnic, religious, sexual and gender minority groups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.581 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.262 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.262 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06761 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health