NY A08125 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the accelerated apportionment of school aid for the 2013-2014 school year for the East Ramapo central school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the accelerated apportionment of school aid for the 2013-2014 school year for the East Ramapo central school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senateapproval memo.31
2014-12-29Senatesigned chap.538
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.335
2014-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5939A
2014-02-25SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2014-02-25Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-02-25Assemblypassed assembly
2014-02-20Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.456
2014-02-12Assemblyreported
2014-01-30Assemblyprint number 8125a
2014-01-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to education
2013-08-30Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05939 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8125A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback