NY A08123 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to telephone corporations', cable corporations', and combination telephone and cable corporations' and voice over internet service providers' service quality standards, credits, reports and penalties.
Title
Relates to telephone corporations', cable corporations', and combination telephone and cable corporations' and voice over internet service providers' service quality standards, credits, reports and penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | print number 8123a |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.508 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05619 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
A08123 (Same As) 2016-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
A08123 (Same As) 2016-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means