NY A08120 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Title
Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | committed to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.580 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.561 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.561 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8120b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8120a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06501 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY