NY A08110 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to an employees' ability to revert back to a previously held non-competitive or labor class title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to an employees' ability to revert back to a previously held non-competitive or labor class title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatetabled
2012-08-17Senatevetoed memo.143
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1463
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5707
2012-03-29SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2012-03-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-03-29Assemblypassed assembly
2012-03-22Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.421
2012-03-20Assemblyreported
2012-01-18Assemblycommitted to governmental employees
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.281
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.500
2011-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.500
2011-06-20Assemblyreported
2011-06-15Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-02Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S05707 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8110

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback