NY A08109 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the safety and security of a research laboratory, and unlawful interference with research laboratory operations.
Title
Relates to the safety and security of a research laboratory, and unlawful interference with research laboratory operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.440 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1555 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5731B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.451 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.451 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8109b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | print number 8109a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05731 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8109B