NY A08104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s5960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes care and services provided by licensed clinical social workers eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes care and services provided by licensed clinical social workers eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s5960
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.426
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.426
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05960 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.149

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback