NY A08102 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6363a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6363a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to order the search for and immediate seizure of firearms, rifles, or shotguns when a defendant willfully refuses to surrender such firearms, rifles or shotguns.
Title
Requires the court to order the search for and immediate seizure of firearms, rifles, or shotguns when a defendant willfully refuses to surrender such firearms, rifles or shotguns.
Sponsors
Asm. Sarah Clark [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Amanda Septimo [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6363a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.203 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 8102a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06363 (Same As) 2022-10-18 - SIGNED CHAP.576