NY A08101 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits state agencies from promulgating rules, regulations or any form of guidance requiring individuals under the age of eighteen who are not exhibiting COVID-19 related symptoms, as defined by the centers for disease control and prevention, to wear a mask or face covering in a public place or while participating in any recreational or organized sporting activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits state agencies from promulgating rules, regulations or any form of guidance requiring individuals under the age of eighteen who are not exhibiting COVID-19 related symptoms, as defined by the centers for disease control and prevention, to wear a mask or face covering in a public place or while participating in any recreational or organized sporting activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-26Assemblyheld for consideration in governmental operations
2022-03-04Assemblyprint number 8101a
2022-03-04Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2021-06-11Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08319 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback