NY A08100 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - print number 8100a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - print number 8100a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to youth programs sponsored by fire departments; provides that participants may respond to an emergency or hazardous activity, but shall remain in an appropriate and safe designated area that has been established by the chief or officer in charge; provides such participants cannot respond to an emergency on a vehicle using lights and/or sirens; provides such participants may not enter a burning structure; protects volunteer fire departments and fire companies from certain criminal and civil liability potentially arising from the operation of a youth program.
Title
Relates to youth programs sponsored by fire departments; provides that participants may respond to an emergency or hazardous activity, but shall remain in an appropriate and safe designated area that has been established by the chief or officer in charge; provides such participants cannot respond to an emergency on a vehicle using lights and/or sirens; provides such participants may not enter a burning structure; protects volunteer fire departments and fire companies from certain criminal and civil liability potentially arising from the operation of a youth program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8100a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07359 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - referred to local governments