NY A08094 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the outdoor Rx act; requires the division of veterans' services to review issues relating to veterans' abilities to access state parks, lands and facilities; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the outdoor Rx act; requires the division of veterans' services to review issues relating to veterans' abilities to access state parks, lands and facilities; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2020-02-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-02-13Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-15Assemblyamended on third reading 8094a
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.311
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.227
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.227
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-31Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S06706 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08094
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08094A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08094&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback