NY A08092 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - advanced to third reading cal.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - advanced to third reading cal.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to agreements for the administration, management or operation of charter schools.
Title
Relates to agreements for the administration, management or operation of charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.512 |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | referred to education |