NY A08090 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.309
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.309
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to juvenile delinquency charges of violations in family court; provides that where an order of fact-finding has been issued that includes a violation committed by a juvenile sixteen years of age or, commencing on October 1, 2019, seventeen years of age, the records shall be sealed automatically without the necessity of a motion; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to juvenile delinquency charges of violations in family court; provides that where an order of fact-finding has been issued that includes a violation committed by a juvenile sixteen years of age or, commencing on October 1, 2019, seventeen years of age, the records shall be sealed automatically without the necessity of a motion; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.309 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.302 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.302 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8090b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 8090a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to children and families |