NY A08088 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - signed chap.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - signed chap.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to revising the period of authorization for the county of Westchester's additional one percent rate of sales and compensating use tax and the expiration of the Westchester county spending limitation act, such 1% increase shall expire on November 30, 2020.
Title
Relates to revising the period of authorization for the county of Westchester's additional one percent rate of sales and compensating use tax and the expiration of the Westchester county spending limitation act, such 1% increase shall expire on November 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.43 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1525 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6304 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.422 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.422 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06304 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - signed chap.43