NY A08083 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-31 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions and proceedings.
Title
Relates to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions and proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-31 | Senate | signed chap.237 |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5833 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.443 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.443 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05833 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8083