NY A08077 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s536a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s536a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces all instances of the word or variations of the word salesman with the word salesperson or variation thereof; amends the language of the real property law to be gender neutral.
Title
Replaces all instances of the word or variations of the word salesman with the word salesperson or variation thereof; amends the language of the real property law to be gender neutral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | substituted by s536a |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.545 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | print number 8077a |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00536 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.529