NY A08059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8167a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8167a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Massena, town of Massena, county of St. Lawrence to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Title
Authorizes the village of Massena, town of Massena, county of St. Lawrence to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8167a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.315 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | print number 8059c |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | print number 8059b |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 8059a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08167 (Same As) 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.267