NY A08049 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - print number 8049b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "access for all act" removing the requirement for in person attendance at public meetings by community boards in a city with a population of over one million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "access for all act" removing the requirement for in person attendance at public meetings by community boards in a city with a population of over one million.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30Assemblyprint number 8049b
2024-04-30Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-12-20Assemblyprint number 8049a
2023-12-20Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2023-09-27Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08793 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback