NY A08036 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implements agreements between the state and an employee organization relating to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees.
Title
Implements agreements between the state and an employee organization relating to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7232 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.747 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.747 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07232 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.150