NY A08021 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-26)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-26)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Vince's law, relating to operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Title
Enacts Vince's law, relating to operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.191 |
2014-07-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1185 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7108 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.75 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | print number 8021a |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07108 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8021A