NY A08019 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts for the transportation of school children; makes provisions regarding the ability to extend such contracts for periods of time and amends provisions relating to requests for proposals and amendments to transportation contracts.
Title
Relates to contracts for the transportation of school children; makes provisions regarding the ability to extend such contracts for periods of time and amends provisions relating to requests for proposals and amendments to transportation contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.298 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2016 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8019c |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8019b |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8019a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.327 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.723 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.723 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05618 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05984 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5984C
S05984 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5984C