NY A08014 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s1223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s1223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the distribution without charge of electronic cigarettes to minors; requires such distribution be made only to an individual who demonstrates, through a driver's license or other photographic identification card issued by a government entity or educational institution indicating that the individual is at least eighteen years of age.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the distribution without charge of electronic cigarettes to minors; requires such distribution be made only to an individual who demonstrates, through a driver's license or other photographic identification card issued by a government entity or educational institution indicating that the individual is at least eighteen years of age.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted by s1223 |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.640 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01223 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.4