NY A08012 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - signed chap.685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - signed chap.685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to pay to Kathleen A. Hope, Troy C. Hightower and Troy E. Sizer, the children of the late David F. Gantt, member of the Assembly, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2020.
Title
Makes an appropriation to pay to Kathleen A. Hope, Troy C. Hightower and Troy E. Sizer, the children of the late David F. Gantt, member of the Assembly, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.685 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1610 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7187 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.648 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.648 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07187 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8012