NY A08010 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.229
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a commercial landlord from interfering with the installation of telephone corporation facilities upon his or her property or premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits a commercial landlord from interfering with the installation of telephone corporation facilities upon his or her property or premises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.229
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2118
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8311A
2018-06-13SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-13Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-13Assemblyrepassed assembly
2018-06-04Assemblyamended on third reading 8010b
2018-06-04Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2018-06-04AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04Senaterecalled from senate
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-05-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-09Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.840
2018-05-01Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8010a
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-05-25Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08311 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8010B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08010
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08010A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08010B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08010&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8010#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback