NY A08000 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage sharks.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage sharks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.137 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5006 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.435 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.435 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05006 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8000