NY A07996 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-18 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-18 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending, in a city with a population of one million or more, the bus rapid transit program.
Title
Relates to extending, in a city with a population of one million or more, the bus rapid transit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-18 | Senate | signed chap.239 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5608A |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.688 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.688 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7996a |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05608 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7996A