NY A07990 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - print number 7990a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - print number 7990a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain notice requirements; and prohibits landlords from including incorrect information relating to rent decontrol in certain leases and renewals thereof pertaining to units subject to the Affordable New York Housing Program.
Title
Relates to certain notice requirements; and prohibits landlords from including incorrect information relating to rent decontrol in certain leases and renewals thereof pertaining to units subject to the Affordable New York Housing Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assembly | print number 7990a |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05651 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES