NY A07987 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duration of certain leases or agreements relating to the sale of food and beverages at Rye town park.
Title
Relates to the duration of certain leases or agreements relating to the sale of food and beverages at Rye town park.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6474 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.516 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.516 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06474 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.325