NY A07986 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the installation or covering of mercury-containing flooring in elementary and secondary schools.
Title
Eliminates the installation or covering of mercury-containing flooring in elementary and secondary schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.565 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.468 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7986 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1028 |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6145 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.468 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.468 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06145 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.565