NY A07973 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Montauk Point shoals as an important bird area, and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to designate such area as part of the New York state bird conservation area program.
Title
Designates the Montauk Point shoals as an important bird area, and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to designate such area as part of the New York state bird conservation area program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.46 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.46 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7973a |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |