NY A07970 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 7970c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 7970c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to allocate specified funds to provide basic school supplies for students in kindergarten through twelfth grade.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to allocate specified funds to provide basic school supplies for students in kindergarten through twelfth grade.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | print number 7970c |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | print number 7970b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7970a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06810 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 6810A