NY A07969 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - print number 7969a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - print number 7969a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of regulatory information to small businesses through the establishment of a small business regulatory nexus by certain agencies.
Title
Relates to the provision of regulatory information to small businesses through the establishment of a small business regulatory nexus by certain agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | print number 7969a |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00028 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - referred to governmental operations